Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1913 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1288 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1913 | 26/06/1966 | ||
1291 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1913 | 07/06/1965 | ||
1292 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1913 | 14/11/1965 | ||
1293 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1913 | 04/09/1966 | ||
1294 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1913 | 29/04/1963 | ||
1311 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1913 | 10/06/1963 | ||
1335 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1913 | 16/05/1967 | ||
1361 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 08/1913 | 31/08/1964 | ||
1362 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 08/1913 | 31/12/1966 | ||
1363 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 09/1913 | 15/07/1963 |