Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | J25 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
536 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 27/09/1954 | ||
1724 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 08/1938 | ||
1725 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 23/05/1951 | ||
1726 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 02/06/1958 | ||
1727 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 08/1938 | ||
2031 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 08/1933 | ||
2032 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1899 | 10/07/1948 | ||
2033 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1899 | 02/03/1959 | ||
2034 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1899 | 18/01/1954 | ||
2035 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1899 | 01/1937 | ||
2036 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1899 | 08/1933 | ||
2037 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1899 | 14/10/1958 | ||
2038 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1899 | 02/1947 | ||
2039 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 10/1899 | 04/1933 | ||
2040 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 31/05/1951 | ||
2041 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 16/09/1957 | ||
2042 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 30/04/1950 | ||
2043 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 01/1946 | ||
2044 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 02/06/1958 | ||
2045 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 11/04/1949 |