Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1905 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J26 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
835 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 15/05/1961 | ||
881 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 19/07/1958 | ||
1146 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 05/1905 | 04/06/1962 | ||
1390 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 29/01/1962 | ||
1194 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 04/03/1959 | ||
1200 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 19/07/1958 | ||
1202 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 18/02/1959 | ||
1208 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 19/07/1958 | ||
1370 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 04/06/1962 | ||
1781 | J26 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1905 | 23/10/1961 |