Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1088 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7477 Week
» 27919 Month
» 364765 Year
» 1586330 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DA679
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 12/1943
For 4 Steam locomotives
Class A2
Information Originally due to be built as class V2 but 'hijacked' by Thompson.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
3696 1930 A2 LNER Thompson 4-6-2 13/05/1944 12/12/1960  
3697 1933 A2 LNER Thompson 4-6-2 30/06/1944 20/02/1961  
3698 1944 A2 LNER Thompson 4-6-2 15/11/1944 15/08/1960  
3699 1950 A2 LNER Thompson 4-6-2 13/01/1945 21/11/1960