Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1914 |
For | 19 Steam locomotives |
Class | C7 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2193 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 12/1914 | 30/08/1948 | ||
2194 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 12/1914 | 09/1944 | ||
2195 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 12/1914 | 06/1947 | ||
2196 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 02/1915 | 10/07/1948 | ||
2197 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 02/1915 | 24/07/1948 | ||
2198 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 03/1915 | 24/07/1948 | ||
2199 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 03/1915 | 06/1944 | ||
2200 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 03/1915 | 04/1946 | ||
2201 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 04/1915 | 09/1947 | ||
2202 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 05/1915 | 10/1943 | ||
2203 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 06/1915 | 24/07/1948 | ||
2204 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 06/1915 | 30/08/1948 | ||
2205 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 11/1916 | 02/1945 | ||
2206 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 11/1916 | 08/11/1947 | ||
2207 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 01/1917 | 01/11/1948 | ||
2208 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 02/1917 | 05/03/1948 | ||
2209 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 04/1917 | 02/1944 | ||
2210 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 05/1917 | 10/07/1948 | ||
2211 | C7 | NER | Raven | 4-4-2 | 06/1917 | 08/11/1947 |