Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 04/1926 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Shire/Hunt |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
245 | 1389 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 07/02/1928 | 03/10/1960 | |
281 | 1390 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 09/02/1928 | 01/05/1961 | |
246 | 1391 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 20/02/1928 | 03/07/1961 | |
249 | 1392 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 21/02/1928 | 09/09/1957 | |
250 | 1393 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 02/03/1928 | 26/08/1959 | |
306 | 1394 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 06/03/1928 | 29/06/1959 | |
307 | 1395 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 17/03/1928 | 28/04/1961 | |
309 | 1396 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 26/03/1928 | 13/01/1961 | |
310 | 1397 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 03/05/1928 | 24/04/1961 | |
311 | 1398 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 05/05/1928 | 01/01/1960 |