Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 04/1926 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | Shire/Hunt |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 1399 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 07/05/1928 | 06/10/1959 | |
320 | 1400 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 23/05/1928 | 18/08/1958 | |
322 | 1401 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 10/07/1928 | 20/10/1959 | |
327 | 1402 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 11/07/1928 | 16/01/1961 | |
335 | 1403 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 28/08/1928 | 17/12/1957 | |
329 | 1404 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 30/08/1928 | 10/11/1958 |