Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 02/1928 |
For | 8 Steam locomotives |
Class | Shire/Hunt |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2753 | 1437 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 20/02/1929 | 29/10/1959 | |
2754 | 1438 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 08/04/1929 | 01/05/1961 | |
2755 | 1439 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 15/03/1929 | 11/12/1958 | |
2756 | 1440 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 21/03/1929 | 03/04/1959 | |
2757 | 1441 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 28/03/1929 | 03/11/1958 | |
2758 | 1442 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 28/03/1929 | 24/04/1961 | |
2759 | 1443 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 05/1929 | 04/03/1961 | |
2760 | 1444 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 20/06/1929 | 25/08/1958 |