Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 12/1929 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Shire/Hunt |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
201 | 1546 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 20/04/1932 | 19/06/1958 | |
211 | 1547 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 04/05/1932 | 01/01/1958 | |
220 | 1548 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 03/05/1932 | 21/09/1959 | |
232 | 1549 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 17/05/1932 | 11/10/1960 | |
235 | 1550 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 02/06/1932 | 01/08/1960 | |
247 | 1555 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 14/07/1932 | 30/10/1958 | |
255 | 1556 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 03/08/1932 | 12/11/1958 | |
269 | 1557 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 23/08/1932 | 09/05/1960 | |
273 | 1560 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 12/10/1932 | 30/12/1960 | |
282 | 1562 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 24/10/1932 | 16/03/1959 |