Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 10/1933 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Shire/Hunt |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
363 | 1600 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 15/11/1934 | 30/09/1958 | |
364 | 1601 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 19/11/1934 | 20/10/1958 | |
365 | 1604 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 01/12/1934 | 03/11/1952 | |
366 | 1605 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 07/12/1934 | 12/09/1958 | |
368 | 1606 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 12/12/1934 | 23/09/1959 | |
370 | 1609 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 15/01/1935 | 17/10/1958 | |
374 | 1610 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 22/01/1935 | 24/09/1958 | |
375 | 1611 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 26/01/1935 | 05/08/1958 | |
376 | 1612 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 02/02/1935 | 13/11/1958 | |
377 | 1613 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 11/02/1935 | 04/12/1958 |