Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DAxx2
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 05/1944
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1010 1990 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/11/1946 07/11/1965  
1011 1991 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/11/1946 02/11/1962  
1012 1992 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/11/1946 12/06/1967  
1013 1993 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/12/1946 06/12/1966  
1014 1994 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/12/1946 31/12/1966  
1015 1995 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/01/1947 19/11/1962  
1016 1996 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/01/1947 31/10/1965  
1017 1997 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/01/1947 15/11/1966  
1018 1998 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/02/1947 07/11/1965  
1019 1999 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 24/02/1947 12/03/1967  
1020 2000 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/02/1947 26/11/1962  
1021 2001 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/03/1947 06/06/1967  
1022 2002 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/03/1947 25/11/1966  
1023 2003 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 01/04/1947 31/10/1965  
1024 2004 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/04/1947 15/05/1966  
1025 2005 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/04/1947 02/12/1962  
1026 2006 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/04/1947 10/02/1966  
1027 2007 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/05/1947 16/09/1962  
1028 2008 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/05/1947 08/10/1962  
1029 2009 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 07/06/1947 31/12/1966  
1030 2010 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/06/1947 30/09/1967  
1031 2011 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/07/1947 09/11/1964  
1032 2012 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 07/08/1947 27/11/1966  
1033 2013 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/08/1947 25/03/1963  
1034 2014 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/10/1947 21/12/1964  
1035 2015 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 31/10/1947 12/12/1966  
1036 2016 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/11/1947 16/09/1962  
1037 2017 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/11/1947 18/05/1964  
1038 2018 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 05/12/1947 01/05/1964  
1039 2019 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/12/1947 27/06/1965