Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 11/1947 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | B1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
61350 | 2072 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/07/1949 | 19/11/1966 | |
61351 | 2073 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/08/1949 | 13/07/1964 | |
61352 | 2074 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 25/08/1949 | 22/10/1962 | |
61353 | 2075 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 06/09/1949 | 16/08/1965 | |
61354 | 2076 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/09/1949 | 22/04/1967 | |
61355 | 2077 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 21/09/1949 | 08/06/1964 | |
61356 | 2078 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/09/1949 | 23/07/1964 | |
61357 | 2079 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/10/1949 | 08/06/1965 | |
61358 | 2080 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/10/1949 | 25/12/1963 | |
61359 | 2081 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/10/1949 | 28/12/1963 |