Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 16/06/1925 |
For | 35 Steam locomotives |
Class | J38 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1400 | 1300 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/01/1926 | 25/11/1963 | |
1401 | 1301 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 29/01/1926 | 22/04/1967 | |
1403 | 1302 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/01/1926 | 28/12/1963 | |
1404 | 1303 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/01/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1405 | 1304 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 29/01/1926 | 23/07/1964 | |
1406 | 1305 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/01/1926 | 25/05/1966 | |
1407 | 1306 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/02/1926 | 06/08/1965 | |
1408 | 1307 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/03/1926 | 22/08/1966 | |
1409 | 1308 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 24/02/1926 | 17/09/1964 | |
1410 | 1309 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/02/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1411 | 1310 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/03/1926 | 14/07/1966 | |
1413 | 1311 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/03/1926 | 01/03/1967 | |
1414 | 1312 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 02/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1415 | 1313 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 02/03/1926 | 06/08/1964 | |
1416 | 1314 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1417 | 1315 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 20/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1419 | 1316 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/03/1926 | 30/10/1965 | |
1420 | 1317 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1421 | 1318 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1422 | 1319 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 19/03/1926 | 20/08/1964 | |
1423 | 1320 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 19/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1424 | 1321 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 25/03/1926 | 19/11/1966 | |
1426 | 1322 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 26/03/1926 | 19/10/1966 | |
1427 | 1323 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/03/1926 | 29/12/1962 | |
1428 | 1324 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 01/04/1926 | 29/06/1964 | |
1434 | 1325 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 07/04/1926 | 21/11/1966 | |
1437 | 1326 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 14/04/1926 | 26/02/1965 | |
1440 | 1327 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/04/1926 | 30/12/1964 | |
1441 | 1328 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/04/1926 | 29/12/1962 | |
1442 | 1329 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/04/1926 | 22/04/1967 | |
1443 | 1330 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/05/1926 | 02/09/1966 | |
1444 | 1331 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/1926 | 02/09/1966 | |
1445 | 1332 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 17/05/1926 | 03/03/1966 | |
1446 | 1333 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 25/05/1926 | 17/04/1965 | |
1447 | 1334 | J38 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/05/1926 | 31/12/1966 |