Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 12/1928 |
For | 27 Steam locomotives |
Class | J39 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2770 | 1467 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/08/1929 | 13/12/1962 | |
2771 | 1468 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/09/1929 | 28/09/1959 | |
2772 | 1469 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 11/09/1929 | 15/09/1962 | |
2773 | 1470 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/09/1929 | 27/07/1959 | |
2774 | 1471 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 20/09/1929 | 21/01/1960 | |
2775 | 1472 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/09/1929 | 26/11/1962 | |
2776 | 1473 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 07/10/1929 | 25/07/1960 | |
2777 | 1474 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/10/1929 | 28/09/1959 | |
2778 | 1475 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/10/1929 | 19/04/1961 | |
2779 | 1476 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 25/10/1929 | 05/10/1959 | |
2780 | 1477 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/11/1929 | 17/05/1962 | |
2781 | 1478 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 07/11/1929 | 05/04/1960 | |
2782 | 1479 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 12/11/1929 | 21/02/1961 | |
2783 | 1480 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/11/1929 | 27/01/1962 | |
2784 | 1482 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 26/11/1929 | 26/06/1961 | |
2785 | 1483 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 29/11/1929 | 30/03/1962 | |
1418 | 1484 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 11/12/1929 | 03/12/1962 | |
1425 | 1485 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 19/12/1929 | 03/12/1962 | |
1466 | 1486 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/01/1930 | 23/11/1962 | |
1429 | 1487 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 08/01/1930 | 12/08/1961 | |
1470 | 1488 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/01/1930 | 13/12/1961 | |
1487 | 1489 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/01/1930 | 29/03/1962 | |
1489 | 1490 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/01/1930 | 03/12/1962 | |
1491 | 1491 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 31/01/1930 | 12/09/1962 | |
2786 | 1492 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/02/1930 | 24/05/1962 | |
2787 | 1493 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 17/02/1930 | 16/11/1962 | |
2788 | 1494 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 24/02/1930 | 29/12/1962 |