Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 12/1929 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | J39 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2962 | 1531 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/09/1931 | 05/01/1961 | |
2963 | 1532 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/09/1931 | 29/03/1960 | |
2964 | 1533 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 29/09/1931 | 02/11/1961 | |
2965 | 1534 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/10/1931 | 08/02/1960 | |
2966 | 1535 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 09/12/1931 | 01/02/1960 | |
2967 | 1536 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 29/10/1931 | 21/03/1960 | |
2968 | 1537 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 24/11/1931 | 18/05/1959 | |
2969 | 1538 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/12/1931 | 08/02/1960 | |
2970 | 1539 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 24/12/1931 | 20/06/1961 | |
2971 | 1540 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 22/01/1932 | 28/09/1959 | |
2972 | 1541 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 29/01/1932 | 26/11/1962 | |
2973 | 1542 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 17/02/1932 | 20/11/1959 | |
2974 | 1543 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 19/02/1932 | 03/12/1962 | |
2975 | 1544 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/03/1932 | 25/04/1962 | |
2976 | 1545 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/03/1932 | 17/11/1961 | |
2977 | 1551 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 27/05/1932 | 26/01/1960 | |
2978 | 1552 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 07/06/1932 | 09/10/1961 | |
2979 | 1553 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/06/1932 | 27/11/1962 | |
2980 | 1554 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/06/1932 | 06/10/1959 | |
1453 | 1558 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 31/08/1932 | 18/04/1962 | |
1469 | 1559 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 06/10/1932 | 29/03/1962 | |
1471 | 1561 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/10/1932 | 03/12/1962 | |
1480 | 1563 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 09/11/1932 | 21/07/1961 | |
1482 | 1570 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 24/05/1933 | 16/11/1962 | |
1483 | 1571 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 19/05/1933 | 16/11/1962 |