Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT203
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 10/1923
For 25 Steam locomotives
Class K3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
17   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1924 15/08/1962  
28   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1924 04/11/1962  
32   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1924 16/09/1962  
33   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 09/1924 09/04/1962  
36   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 09/1924 27/12/1961  
38   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 11/07/1960  
39   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 31/05/1962  
46   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 16/09/1962  
52   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 05/03/1962  
53   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 17/12/1962  
58   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 04/11/1962  
69   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 16/09/1962  
73   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1924 04/11/1962  
75   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1924 29/12/1959  
80   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1924 05/07/1961  
91   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1924 16/09/1962  
92   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1924 16/09/1962  
109   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1924 16/09/1962  
111   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1924 20/03/1961  
112   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1924 28/02/1962  
113   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1924 04/11/1962  
114   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1924 16/09/1962  
116   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1924 03/11/1962  
118   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1924 20/09/1961  
120   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1924 15/05/1962