Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT204
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 11/1923
For 25 Steam locomotives
Class K3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
121   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1925 16/09/1962  
125   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1925 08/02/1960  
126   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1925 27/04/1962  
127   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1925 21/03/1960  
134   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1925 09/01/1962  
135   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 16/09/1962  
140   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 31/03/1962  
141   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 21/08/1961  
143   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 03/11/1962  
146   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 05/06/1961  
153   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 16/09/1962  
156   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 17/12/1962  
158   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1925 10/12/1962  
159   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 16/09/1962  
163   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 17/04/1961  
167   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 30/06/1961  
170   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 25/11/1961  
178   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 18/07/1961  
180   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 18/12/1962  
184   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 29/10/1962  
186   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 06/07/1959  
188   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1925 17/12/1962  
191   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 04/1925 03/12/1962  
195   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 04/1925 26/04/1961  
200   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 04/1925 04/11/1962