Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT205
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 11/1924
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class K3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
203   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1925 16/11/1961  
202   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1925 12/01/1962  
204   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1925 16/01/1962  
206   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 09/1925 06/06/1960  
207   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 09/1925 16/09/1962  
208   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 09/1925 06/1961  
227   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1925 19/10/1961  
228   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1925 04/11/1962  
229   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1925 10/05/1962  
231   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1925 03/12/1962