Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT208
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 12/1928
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class K3
Information 2761 Series

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2761   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1930 16/09/1962  
2762   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1930 12/09/1961  
2763   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1930 30/10/1961  
2764   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1930 17/12/1962  
2765   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1930 30/10/1961  
2766   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1930 18/07/1962  
2767   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1930 14/05/1962  
2768   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1930 17/12/1962  
2769   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1930 07/02/1959