Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT214
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 09/1935
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class K3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
3813   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1936 04/11/1962  
3814   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1936 02/07/1962  
3815   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1936 04/09/1961  
3816   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1936 04/01/1962  
3817   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1936 16/09/1962  
3818   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1936 17/08/1961  
3819   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1936 16/10/1961  
3820   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1936 17/12/1962  
3821   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1936 04/11/1962  
3822   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1936 16/09/1962  
3823   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1936 10/07/1959  
3824   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1936 02/11/1962  
3825   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1937 21/12/1962  
3826   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1937 28/05/1962  
3827   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1937 19/03/1962  
3828   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 01/1937 16/11/1959  
3829   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1937 19/06/1962  
3830   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1937 13/10/1960  
3831   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1937 07/05/1959  
3832   K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 02/1937 06/06/1960