Manufacturer: Derby Works
Builder | Derby Works |
Order Date | 1944 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4800 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1944 | 16/03/1968 | ||
4801 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1944 | 05/1964 | ||
4802 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1944 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4803 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1944 | 06/1968 | ||
4804 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1944 | 02/03/1968 | ||
4805 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4806 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1944 | 03/08/1968 | ||
5492 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1944 | 31/12/1966 | ||
5493 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1944 | 06/01/1968 | ||
5494 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
5495 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1944 | 04/03/1967 | ||
5496 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1944 | 08/06/1964 | ||
5497 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1944 | 02/1964 | ||
5498 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1944 | 26/06/1965 | ||
5499 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1944 | 07/1965 |