Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 87 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3899 Week
» 33397 Month
» 370243 Year
» 1591808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/214
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 07/1899
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class C12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1511 832 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 08/1899 19/07/1954  
1512 833 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 08/1899 04/1937  
1513 834 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 08/1899 01/01/1948  
1514 835 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 09/1899 04/04/1955  
1515 836 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 10/1899 06/1937  
1516 837 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 10/1899 11/1937  
1517 838 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 10/1899 18/05/1953  
1518 839 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 10/1899 05/03/1951  
1519 840 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 11/1899 02/04/1958  
1520 841 C12 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2T 11/1899 05/04/1955