Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1905 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
293 | 1067 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1905 | 02/07/1948 | |
297 | 1068 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1905 | 05/02/1947 | |
296 | 1069 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1905 | 07/12/1945 | |
294 | 1070 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1905 | 27/11/1950 | |
295 | 1071 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1905 | 08/08/1947 | |
298 | 1072 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 05/1905 | 04/04/1945 | |
299 | 1073 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1905 | 25/05/1945 | |
301 | 1074 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1905 | 22/07/1948 | |
300 | 1075 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1905 | 29/08/1949 | |
1400 | 1076 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 06/1905 | 06/12/1947 |