Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 75 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 23211 Month
» 23211 Year
» 1244776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/241
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 1905
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class C1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1401 1077 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 06/1905 16/11/1946  
1402 1078 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 06/1905 05/08/1947  
1403 1079 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 06/1905 04/07/1947  
1405 1080 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 06/1905 14/08/1947  
1404 1081 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 06/1905 08/08/1947  
1406 1082 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 06/1905 16/02/1946  
1407 1083 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 07/1905 06/06/1944  
1408 1084 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 07/1905 26/07/1945  
1409 1085 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 07/1905 23/01/1950  
1410 1086 C1 GNR Ivatt 4-4-2 08/1905 29/04/1947