Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1905 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J52 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1271 | 1087 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 10/1905 | 22/03/1958 | |
1272 | 1088 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 10/1905 | 10/02/1958 | |
1273 | 1089 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 10/1905 | 21/08/1956 | |
1274 | 1090 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 10/1905 | 30/09/1955 | |
1275 | 1091 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 11/1905 | 16/10/1957 | |
1276 | 1092 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 11/1905 | 20/03/1961 | |
1277 | 1093 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 11/1905 | 05/03/1956 | |
1278 | 1094 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 11/1905 | 20/11/1956 | |
1279 | 1095 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 11/1905 | 25/05/1956 | |
1280 | 1096 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1905 | 20/09/1955 |