Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 01/1906 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
441 | 1139 | Q1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-8-0 | 12/1906 | 11/06/1930 | |
442 | 1140 | Q1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-8-0 | 01/1907 | 27/09/1930 | |
443 | 1141, | Q1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-8-0 | 12/1906 | 02/01/1929 | |
444 | 1142 | Q1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-8-0 | 12/1906 | 12/07/1932 | |
445 | 1143 | Q1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-8-0 | 12/1906 | 27/06/1928 |