Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 07/1908 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | J1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 1198 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 08/1908 | 08/1947 | |
2 | 1202 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1908 | 08/1947 | |
3 | 1203 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1908 | 21/08/1954 | |
4 | 1204 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1908 | 12/01/1953 | |
5 | 1205 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1908 | 17/11/1952 | |
6 | 1206 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1908 | 19/05/1952 | |
7 | 1207 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 07/1951 | |
8 | 1208 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 04/02/1952 | |
9 | 1209 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 24/03/1952 | |
10 | 1210 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 31/03/1952 | |
11 | 1211 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1908 | 19/01/1953 | |
12 | 1212 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 11/1908 | 08/1947 | |
13 | 1213 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 11/1908 | 08/1947 | |
14 | 1214 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 11/1908 | 22/11/1954 | |
15 | 1215 | J1 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 11/1908 | 05/08/1953 |