Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1912 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J2 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
71 | 1351 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 08/1912 | 14/12/1953 | |
72 | 1352 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 08/1912 | 19/10/1953 | |
73 | 1353 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 08/1912 | 01/1954 | |
74 | 1355 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1912 | 16/11/1953 | |
75 | 1356 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1912 | 02/03/1953 | |
76 | 1357 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1912 | 12/07/1954 | |
77 | 1358 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 09/1912 | 11/1950 | |
78 | 1359 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1912 | 14/12/1953 | |
79 | 1360 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1912 | 09/11/1953 | |
80 | 1361 | J2 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1912 | 07/1946 |