Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3117 Week
» 14688 Month
» 262981 Year
» 1147362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/290
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 1920
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class K3
Information 17 Series

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1000 1509 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 03/1920 13/07/1962  
1001 1513 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 06/1920 17/04/1962  
1002 1514 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 09/1920 07/03/1960  
1003 1515 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1920 13/07/1961  
1004 1516 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1920 31/03/1962  
1005 1517 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1920 16/09/1962  
1006 1520 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 04/1921 07/03/1960  
1007 1522 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 05/1921 04/11/1962  
1008 1526 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 07/1921 25/09/1961  
1009 1529 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 08/1921 03/03/1962