Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1922 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J50 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
221 | 1544 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 10/1922 | 20/07/1961 | |
222 | 1545 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1922 | 26/04/1961 | |
223 | 1546 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1922 | 23/09/1963 | |
224 | 1547 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1922 | 13/12/1961 | |
225 | 1548 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1922 | 14/02/1961 | |
226 | 1549 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1922 | 18/03/1963 | |
227 | 1550 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1922 | 13/02/1962 | |
228 | 1551 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1922 | 17/04/1961 | |
229 | 1552 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1922 | 09/1962 | |
230 | 1553 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1922 | 02/05/1961 |