Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1926 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J50 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1037 | 1656 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1926 | 31/08/1961 | |
1041 | 1657 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1926 | 25/07/1961 | |
1045 | 1658 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1926 | 09/1962 | |
1058 | 1659 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1926 | 16/06/1961 | |
1063 | 1660 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1926 | 13/02/1962 | |
1068 | 1661 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1926 | 01/10/1962 | |
1069 | 1662 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1926 | 23/09/1963 | |
1070 | 1663 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1926 | 01/08/1961 | |
1074 | 1664 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 01/1927 | 16/06/1959 | |
1079 | 1665 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 01/1927 | 26/04/1961 |