Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/316
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 08/1927
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class K3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1387 1721 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1929 16/09/1962  
1388 1722 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1929 21/04/1960  
1389 1723 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1929 28/05/1960  
1391 1724 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 10/1929 03/12/1962  
1392 1725 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1929 23/07/1962  
1394 1726 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1929 03/11/1959  
1395 1727 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1929 16/09/1962  
1396 1728 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 11/1929 02/03/1962  
1397 1729 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1929 25/09/1961  
1398 1730 K3 GNR Gresley 2-6-0 12/1929 04/11/1962