Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/318
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 1930
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class J50

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2789 1732 J50 GNR Gresley 0-6-0T 03/1930 16/09/1962  
2790 1734 J50 GNR Gresley 0-6-0T 03/1930 21/07/1959  
2791 1735 J50 GNR Gresley 0-6-0T 03/1930 03/08/1959  
2792 1737 J50 GNR Gresley 0-6-0T 04/1930 29/07/1961  
2793 1739 J50 GNR Gresley 0-6-0T 04/1930 09/1962  
2794 1740 J50 GNR Gresley 0-6-0T 04/1930 23/09/1963