Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 01/1929 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | V1 |
Information | Built for Scotland |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2900 | 1745 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 09/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
2901 | 1746 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 10/1930 | 22/01/1962 | |
2902 | 1747 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 10/1930 | 07/05/1962 | |
2903 | 1748 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 10/1930 | 02/04/1962 | |
2904 | 1749 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 11/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
2905 | 1750 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 11/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
2906 | 1751 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
2907 | 1752 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
2908 | 1753 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
2909 | 1754 | V1 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 02/1931 | 05/02/1962 |