Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 03/1935 |
For | 4 Steam locomotives |
Class | A4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2509 | 1818 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 07/09/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
2510 | 1819 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 21/09/1935 | 25/04/1963 | |
2511 | 1821 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 05/11/1935 | 19/03/1965 | |
2512 | 1823 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 18/12/1935 | 20/10/1963 |