Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 01/1936 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | A4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4482 | 1847 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 22/12/1936 | 30/10/1964 | |
4483 | 1848 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 26/12/1936 | 05/09/1966 | |
4484 | 1849 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 23/01/1937 | 20/10/1963 | |
4485 | 1850 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 20/02/1937 | 21/12/1965 | |
4486 | 1851 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 13/03/1937 | 03/09/1965 | |
4487 | 1852 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 20/03/1937 | 29/12/1962 | |
4488 | 1853 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 29/06/1937 | 01/06/1966 | |
4489 | 1854 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 04/05/1937 | 29/05/1965 | |
4490 | 1855 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 25/06/1937 | 11/05/1964 | |
4491 | 1856 | A4 | LNER | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 22/06/1937 | 20/08/1964 |