Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 12/1938 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | V3 |
Information | Built for the N.E. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 1902 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 09/1939 | 23/09/1963 | |
391 | 1903 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 10/1939 | 23/09/1963 | |
392 | 1904 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 10/1939 | 02/11/1964 | |
393 | 1905 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 12/1939 | 10/12/1962 | |
395 | 1906 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 12/1939 | 23/09/1963 | |
396 | 1907 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 12/1939 | 29/12/1962 | |
397 | 1908 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 02/1940 | 29/12/1962 | |
398 | 1909 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 02/1940 | 29/12/1962 | |
399 | 1910 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 03/1940 | 24/11/1964 | |
401 | 1911 | V3 | LNER | Gresley | 2-6-2T | 04/1940 | 24/11/1964 |