Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Dübs & Co



Order Details for Lot No: DU/DU726
Builder Dübs & Co
Order Date 1899
For 33 Steam locomotives
Class J4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1103   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 01/1899 02/06/1952  
1105   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 01/1899 07/1951  
1106   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 02/1899 11/1950  
1107   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 02/1899 25/11/1950  
1109   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 02/1899 04/1953  
1113   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 03/1899 21/05/1951  
1114   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 03/1899 10/1951  
1125   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 31/12/1953  
1129   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 04/1949  
1131   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 25/11/1950  
1133   J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 01/09/1952  
1104 3698 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 01/1899 10/1935  
1108 3702 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 02/1899 09/1935  
1110 3704 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 02/1899 08/1938  
1111 3705 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 03/1899 06/1937  
1112 3706 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 03/1899 07/1932  
1115 3709 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 03/1899 01/1933  
1116 3710 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 01/1936  
1117 3711 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 04/1933  
1118 3712 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 03/1934  
1119 3713 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 07/1932  
1120 3714 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 11/1932  
1121 3715 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 02/1935  
1122 3716 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 09/1933  
1123 3717 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 03/1934  
1124 3718 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 04/1899 04/1936  
1126 3720 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 02/1946  
1127 3721 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 03/1936  
1128 3722 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 02/1936  
1130 3724 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 07/1932  
1132 3726 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 08/1935  
1134 3728 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 08/1947  
1135 3729 J4 GNR Ivatt 0-6-0 05/1899 02/1932