Manufacturer: Gateshead Works
Builder | Gateshead Works |
Order Date | 1902 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q5 |
Information | NER Class T1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
527 | 1 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 03/1902 | 31/10/1950 | |
1002 | 2 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 03/1902 | 22/08/1950 | |
130 | 20 01 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 03/1902 | 21/06/1950 | |
1320 | 3 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 03/1902 | 01/11/1948 | |
1700 | 4 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 04/1902 | 26/06/1948 | |
1704 | 5 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 04/1902 | 26/04/1947 | |
1708 | 6 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 05/1902 | 22/11/1947 | |
1709 | 7 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 05/1902 | 06/06/1951 | |
1717 | 8 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 06/1902 | 07/02/1948 | |
1729 | 9 02 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 06/1902 | 19/07/1947 |