Manufacturer: Gateshead Works
Builder | Gateshead Works |
Order Date | 1898 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | J25 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1981 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1898 | 14/08/1959 | ||
1982 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1898 | 26/11/1958 | ||
1983 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 11/1898 | 08/1950 | ||
1984 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 08/1933 | ||
1985 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 21/02/1951 | ||
1986 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 12/01/1953 | ||
1987 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 04/10/1954 | ||
1988 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 06/06/1960 | ||
1989 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 05/04/1962 | ||
1990 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 24/09/1952 | ||
1991 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 10/1949 | ||
1992 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 04/07/1960 | ||
1993 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1899 | 21/09/1954 | ||
1994 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1899 | 03/1949 | ||
1995 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1899 | 04/1950 | ||
1996 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 03/1899 | 08/1933 | ||
1997 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 04/1899 | 10/1933 | ||
1998 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 04/1899 | 10/1938 | ||
1999 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 04/1899 | 08/1933 | ||
2000 | J25 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 04/06/1962 |