Manufacturer: Gateshead Works
Builder | Gateshead Works |
Order Date | 1897 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J24 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1931 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 29/11/1948 | ||
1932 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 10/12/1950 | ||
1933 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 09/1933 | ||
1934 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 25/11/1950 | ||
1935 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 02/05/1949 | ||
1936 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 09/1943 | ||
1937 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 20/11/1950 | ||
1938 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 10/1938 | ||
1939 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 10/1938 | ||
1940 | J24 | NER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 09/1933 |