Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 712 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4533 Week
» 21869 Month
» 299665 Year
» 1184046 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/340
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 01/1911
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class O4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
966 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1911 18/11/1959  
331 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1911 19/12/1963  
332 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1911 03/10/1965  
333 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1911 21/04/1964  
334 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1911 03/11/1962  
335 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1911 03/11/1962  
26 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1911 03/12/1963  
69 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1911 03/12/1963  
93 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1911 21/08/1959  
102 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1912 16/06/1963  
133 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1912 05/09/1965  
155 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1912 25/05/1961  
400 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1912 09/12/1962  
402 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1912 26/10/1941  
403 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1912 14/09/1959  
404 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1912 23/09/1962  
405 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1912 14/11/1960  
406 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1912 13/06/1965  
407 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1912 02/03/1962  
408 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1912 18/07/1963