Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 209 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 209 Week
» 22715 Month
» 325905 Year
» 1547470 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/404
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 01/1912
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class O4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
346 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1912 04/10/1941  
347 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1912 12/12/1962  
348 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1912 16/04/1959  
349 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 16/01/1964  
350 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1912 23/09/1962  
351 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1912 09/05/1962  
352 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1912 04/05/1959  
353 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1912 30/11/1960  
354 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1912 10/09/1941  
355 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1912 22/06/1959