Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/413
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 01/1913
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class O4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
375 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1913 11/10/1941  
376 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1913 10/09/1941  
377 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1913 29/12/1962  
378 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1913 21/07/1962  
379 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1913 01/05/1964  
380 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1913 08/08/1962  
381 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1913 13/06/1965  
382 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1913 10/09/1941  
383 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1913 10/09/1941  
384 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1913 23/09/1962