Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/435
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 01/1913
For 16 Steam locomotives
Class O4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
385 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1913 24/11/1962  
386 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1914 26/03/1964  
387 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1914 14/11/1965  
388 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1914 25/07/1965  
389 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1914 28/04/1959  
390 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1914 07/09/1964  
391 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1914 23/09/1962  
392 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1914 19/09/1941  
393 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1914 24/02/1963  
394 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1914 21/10/1963  
395 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1914 23/02/1959  
396 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1914 23/09/1962  
397 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1914 01/05/1963  
398 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1914 09/02/1962  
399 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1914 09/12/1962  
271 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1914 05/10/1941