Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Class | O5 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
412 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 01/1918 | 11/04/1965 | ||
413 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 03/1918 | 08/11/1941 | ||
414 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 04/1918 | 23/11/1961 | ||
415 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 08/04/1959 | ||
417 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 03/01/1965 | ||
418 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1918 | 22/05/1964 | ||
419 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1918 | 01/10/1963 | ||
420 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 04/1919 | 14/09/1941 | ||
421 | O5 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 07/1919 | 11/10/1941 |