Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 199 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5420 Week
» 20534 Month
» 323724 Year
» 1545289 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/555
Builder Gorton Works
Class O5

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
412 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 11/04/1965  
413 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 08/11/1941  
414 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 23/11/1961  
415 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 08/04/1959  
417 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 03/01/1965  
418 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 22/05/1964  
419 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1918 01/10/1963  
420 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1919 14/09/1941  
421 O5 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1919 11/10/1941