Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 1913 |
For | 11 Steam locomotives |
Class | B8 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 06/1913 | 28/11/1947 | ||
439 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 07/1914 | 14/08/1947 | ||
440 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 08/1914 | 23/10/1947 | ||
441 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 09/1914 | 06/05/1947 | ||
442 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 09/1914 | 24/03/1949 | ||
443 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 10/1914 | 15/03/1948 | ||
444 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 10/1914 | 02/09/1948 | ||
445 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 11/1914 | 14/08/1947 | ||
446 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 11/1914 | 23/04/1949 | ||
279 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 12/1914 | 13/08/1948 | ||
280 | B8 | GCR | Robinson | 4-6-0 | 01/1915 | 25/03/1947 |