Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 1938 |
For | 8 Steam locomotives |
Class | J50 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
599 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1938 | 19/11/1958 | ||
600 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 11/1938 | 06/02/1961 | ||
602 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1938 | 22/02/1960 | ||
605 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1938 | 19/04/1961 | ||
606 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 12/1938 | 16/09/1962 | ||
608 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 01/1939 | 24/04/1962 | ||
611 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 02/1939 | 25/03/1963 | ||
615 | J50 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-0T | 04/1939 | 16/11/1959 |