Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO633
Builder Gorton Works
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class B3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1169 B3 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 11/1917 06/12/1947  
1164 B3 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 06/1920 27/09/1947  
1165 B3 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 07/1920 31/12/1947  
1166 B3 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 08/1920 14/04/1949  
1167 B3 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 09/1920 31/12/1947  
1168 B3 GCR Robinson 4-6-0 10/1920 28/09/1946